skip to content

Koch, Bernd Richard Oskar

CPSO#: 19013

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 312 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 11 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008