skip to content

Kobylecky, Anna Audrey

CPSO#: 32593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 29
100 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone: (905) 641-4511 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kobylecky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kobylecky ( CPSO# 32593 )

Business Address:
29 - 100 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 641-4511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA AUDREY KOBYLECKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBYLECKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985