skip to content

Koblic, Paul Michael

CPSO#: 88820

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Koblic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Koblic ( CPSO# 88820 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL KOBLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBLIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010