skip to content

Kobetz, Lawrence Elliot

CPSO#: 26745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
835 Paramount Drive
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 0B4
Phone: 905 561 2200
Fax: 905 561 2204 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Kobetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kobetz ( CPSO# 26745 )

Business Address:
102 - 835 Paramount Drive
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 561-2200

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Stor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905-892-0010 Tel 2: 905-380-8616 Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 26 Sep 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ELLIOT KOBETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1974