skip to content

Kobetz, Lawrence Elliot

CPSO#: 26745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
2757 King St. East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Kobetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Stor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905-892-0010 Tel 2: 905-380-8616 Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 26 Sep 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ELLIOT KOBETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2021