skip to content

Ko, Hyun Soo

CPSO#: 92490

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 15 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010