skip to content

Ko, Hyang Mi

CPSO#: 91434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Chonnam National University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
and Pathobiology, 11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5197
Fax: (416) 340-5517 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:26 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active
             Dr. Hyang Mi Ko may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.