skip to content

Ko, Gary Tsun Yin

CPSO#: 100257

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hernia Centre
7750 Bayview Ave
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 905-889-1125 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARY TSUN YIN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018