skip to content

Knyahnytska, Yuliya Oleksandrivna

CPSO#: 99533

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2017
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Temerty Centre
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 4, # 126
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34648 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yuliya Knyahnytska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Knyahnytska ( CPSO# 99533 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Temerty Centre
4-1001 Queen Street West
Room 126
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2012 to 08 Jan 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2024

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2017 Active
 
            1.    Dr. Yuliya Oleksandrivna Knyahnytska may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Knyahnytska holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Knyahnytska  no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Knyahnytska's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Knyahnytska's
                        certificate   of  registration,  following  consideration  of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  September  1,  2017.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2024.