skip to content

Knox, David Campbell

CPSO#: 95998

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Leaf Medical Clinic
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 465-0756
Fax: (416) 465-8344 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Casey House
119 Isabella St
Toronto ON  M4Y 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 962-7600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Knox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Knox ( CPSO# 95998 )

Business Address:
Maple Leaf Medical Clinic
Suite 501
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 465-0756

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Casey House Hospice Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID CAMPBELL KNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013