skip to content

Knight, Eric Alan

CPSO#: 27179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 May 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
239 Dovercourt Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7H3
Phone: (613) 728-8182
Fax: (613) 728-8182 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Knight ( CPSO# 27179 )

Business Address:
239 Dovercourt Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7H3
Phone Number: (613) 728-8182

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 May 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 May 2013 Active
             As from May 8, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eric Knight, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Knight to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Knight has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  all narcotics and narcotic preparations.