skip to content

Kluz, Andrzej Tomasz

CPSO#: 96859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Poznan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seaforth Community Hospital
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 527-1650 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. M. Kluz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kluz ( CPSO# 96859 )
Dr. A. Kluz ( CPSO# 96685 )

Business Address:
Huron Community Family Health Team
Unit 32B
1 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 600-2273

Business Address:
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-1650

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ TOMASZ KLUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLUZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012