skip to content

Klotz, Laurence Harold

CPSO#: 30375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Feb 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Urology
Room MG 408
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4673
Fax: (416) 480-6121 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Klotz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Klotz ( CPSO# 30375 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Urology
MG408 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4673

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 16 Feb 2019 Active
             As from February 16, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Laurence Harold
            Klotz in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Klotz to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. LAURENCE HAROLD KLOTZ
                                          ("Dr. Klotz")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Klotz, certificate of registration number 30375, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 7216525 and 100516 into my urology practice (the
                  "Investigations").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   programs satisfactory to the College in communications. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and any participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to complete this requirement by November
                        30, 2019 or, if a program satisfactory to the College is not
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to perform ureteric and renal surgery for
                        trauma cases requiring immediate operative intervention (within
                        eight [8] hours of injury) only in the presence of the general
                        surgeon on call for trauma surgery, who is prepared to assist if
                        needed. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake, subject to sections 6(c) and (d) below, to
                        abide in all respects by the terms set out in my agreement with
                        Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre (my "Practice Agreement"), the
                        relevant parts of which are attached to this Undertaking at
                        Appendix "B," by which, among other things, I will not perform:
                  
                        i.    Partial nephrectomies;
                        ii.   Nephro-ureterectomies;
                        iii.  Cytoreductive nephrectomies;
                        iv.   Nephrectomies except under the conditions listed in Appendix
                              "A;"
                        v.    Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for testicular cancer;
                        vi.   Reconstructive procedures including ureterectomies for
                              malignancy with ureteral reconstruction;
                        vii.  Radical cystectomies; and
                        viii. Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign or malignant
                              disease.  
                  
                        For greater certainty, I will not perform the procedures set out in
                        section (6)(b)(i) through (viii) above anywhere that I practise
                        medicine. However, I understand that nothing in this section
                        prevents me from performing ureteric and renal surgery as necessary
                        for trauma cases in compliance with section 6(a).  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that if I and Sunnybrook Health Sciences
                        Centre propose at any time to modify any term of my Practice
                        Agreement, we may do so only upon notice to and with the approval
                        of the ICR Committee, the granting of which is within the ICR
                        Committee's discretion. 
                  
            (7)   Reports from Division Head

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to have the Head of the Urology Division at
                        Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another person in a similar
                        position who is acceptable to the College (the "Division Head"),
                        assist in the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have reviewed the undertaking of
                        the Division Head attached hereto as Appendix "C", and understand
                        what is required of the Division Head, including annual reports
                        regarding my compliance and provision of any supporting
                        information.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to ensure that Appendix "C" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within seven
                        (7) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "C" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I currently practise medicine only
                        at (i) Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre and (ii) Can-Am HIFU (my
                        current "Practice Location(s)"). I acknowledge that at Can-Am HIFU
                        my practice is limited to high-intensity focused ultrasound of the
                        prostate.  I undertake that I shall not commence practising
                        medicine at any other location without notifying the College at
                        least fourteen (14) days in advance, and that I shall notify the
                        College immediately if I cease practising at any Practice
                        Location(s). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "D". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              College investigations were conducted into Dr. Klotz's
                              urology practice.   As a result of the investigations:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Klotz will perform ureteric and renal surgery
                                          for trauma cases requiring immediate operative
                                          intervention (within 8 hours of injury) only in
                                          the presence of the general surgeon on call for
                                          trauma surgery, who is prepared to assist if
                                          needed. 
                  
                                    *     Dr. Klotz will abide in all respects with the
                                          terms set out in an agreement with Sunnybrook
                                          Health Sciences Centre, by which, among other
                                          things, he will not perform:
                                          i.    Partial nephrectomies;
                                          ii.   Nephro-ureterectomies;
                                          iii.  Cytoreductive nephrectomies;
                                          iv.   Nephrectomies except under certain
                                                conditions listed in Appendix "A" to his
                                                undertaking;
                                          v.    Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for
                                                testicular cancer;
                                          vi.   Reconstructive procedures including
                                                ureterectomies for malignancy with ureteral
                                                reconstruction;
                                          vii.  Radical cystectomies; and
                                          viii. Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign
                                                or malignant disease.  
                  
                              Dr. Klotz will not perform the above procedures anywhere that
                              he practises medicine. This does not prevent him from
                              performing ureteric and renal surgery as necessary for trauma
                              cases as described above.
                  
                              *     Dr. Klotz will not commence practising medicine at any
                                    location other than Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centreor
                                    Can-Am HIFU without notifying the College at least 14
                                    days in advance, and will notify the College
                                    immediately if he ceases to practise medicine at any of
                                    his practice locations.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information,
                  including all Chief(s) of Staff and the Division Head:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff, the
                  Surgeon-in-Chief and the Division Head to disclose to the College, and to
                  one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the agreement at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the provisions of the Division Head's undertaking set
                        out at Appendix "C";
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 9, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Laurence Harold Klotz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2019:
College investigations were conducted into Dr. Klotz’s urology practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Klotz will perform ureteric and renal surgery for trauma cases requiring immediate operative intervention (within 8 hours of injury) only in the presence of the general surgeon on call for trauma surgery, who is prepared to assist if needed.
Dr. Klotz will abide in all respects with the terms set out in an agreement with Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, by which, among other things, he will not perform:

Partial nephrectomies;
Nephro-ureterectomies;
Cytoreductive nephrectomies;

Nephrectomies except under certain conditions listed in Appendix “A” to his undertaking;

Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for testicular cancer;
Reconstructive procedures including ureterectomies for malignancy with ureteral reconstruction;
Radical cystectomies; and
Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign or malignant disease.

Dr. Klotz will not perform the above procedures anywhere that he practises medicine. This does not prevent him from performing ureteric and renal surgery as necessary for trauma cases as described above.

Dr. Klotz will not commence practising medicine at any location other than Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centreor Can-Am HIFU without notifying the College at least 14 days in advance, and will notify the College immediately if he ceases to practise medicine at any of his practice locations.