skip to content

Klinghoffer, Zachary David

CPSO#: 86213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E5E9
Phone: (416) 479-7680
Fax: (416) 479-7681 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Klinghoffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Klinghoffer ( CPSO# 86213 )
Dr. J. Ostro ( CPSO# 91198 )

Business Address:
402 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 479-7680

Business Address:
318 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-2166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZACHARY DAVID KLINGHOFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLINGHOFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012