skip to content

Klinck, John Rutherford

CPSO#: 29981

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993