skip to content

Kliman, Lorne David

CPSO#: 31579

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Sep 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317 Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 26 Sep 2019 Active
             As from September 26, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lorne David Kliman
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kliman to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. LORNE DAVID KLIMAN
                                          ("Dr. Kliman")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Kliman, certificate of registration number 31579, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College
                  conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1104094 (the
                  "Investigation") into my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College will also deliver a
                  caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Kliman, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kliman, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Self-study on assessment and management of an older patient
                              with syncope, gastrointestinal bleeding, and melena;
                  
                        (ii)  the University of Toronto course in Medical-Record Keeping;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) CMPA eLearning modules:
                  
                              1.    Documentation: Charting Medical Records; and
                  
                              2.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kliman, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kliman, undertake to complete this requirement by February
                        28, 2020 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time,
                        by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kliman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of any person who or institution that may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint, a College investigation was
                              conducted into Dr. Kliman's family practice.  As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Kliman will engage in professional education in
                                    assessment and management of an older patient with
                                    syncope, gastrointestinal bleeding, and melena; and
                                    medical record-keeping.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kliman, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Kliman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Kliman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Kliman, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 26, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorne David Kliman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 26, 2019:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Kliman’s family practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Kliman will engage in professional education in assessment and management of an older patient with syncope, gastrointestinal bleeding, and melena; and medical record-keeping.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)