skip to content

Klieger-Grossmann, Chagit

CPSO#: 87663

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010