skip to content

Kliber, Agnes

CPSO#: 89837

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective:07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 03 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
EL - Respirology

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
EL - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011