skip to content

Kletke, Richard Rudolph

CPSO#: 17399

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002