skip to content

Klein, George Joseph

CPSO#: 25766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Cardiac Institute
Suite 201
1055 Fanshawe Park Road W
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone: (519) 645-0146
Fax: (519) 645-1548 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Arrhythmia Service
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. J. Klein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Klein ( CPSO# 25766 )

Business Address:
Cardiac Investigation Unit
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Business Address:
London Cardiac Institute
302 - 256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEORGE JOSEPH KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973