skip to content

Kizis, Jeffrey James Jones

CPSO#: 88522

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Emergency Medical Services
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Fax: (519) 837-0133 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi St
Medical clinic
Colonial zero
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Canada
Phone: 519-824-1010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Kizis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kizis ( CPSO# 88522 )

Business Address:
Guelph Emergency Medical Service
Department of Family Medicine
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-0133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES JONES KIZIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIZIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011