skip to content

Kizilbash, Kamran

CPSO#: 90221

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dow Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island
USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016