skip to content

Kivinen, Gary William

CPSO#: 27232

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Kivinen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Tel: 705 560 8461 Fax: 705 524 8012
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014