Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Feb 2010
Summary:
On February 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe’s admission and found that Dr. Kitakufe engaged in acts of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and that he has committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
On August 29, 2007, Dr. Kitakufe pleaded guilty to, and was convicted of the criminal charges of: unlawfully conspired to commit Fraud exceeding $5000, by participation in a scheme to defraud the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care through the use of fraudulent prescriptions for oxycodone; unlawfully conspired to commit the indictable offence of Trafficking in a controlled substance, oxycodone; and, unlawfully by deceit, falsehood or other fraudulent means, defrauded the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care of money of a value exceeding $5000 by submitting fraudulent claims for medical services, for which the Ministry remitted payment. Dr. Kitakufe was sentenced to 32 months in custody and ordered to pay restitution in the amount of $50,000.
After hearing submissions and evidence on penalty, the Committee reserved its decision on penalty on March 3, 2010. On September 3, 2010, the Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Kitakufe appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.
2. The Registrar revoke Dr. Kitakufe’s certificate of registration effective immediately.
The Committee also ordered that Dr. Kitakufe shall pay to the College its costs fixed at $18,250.00 within six (6) months of the date of this order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 8-12, March 3, 2010
Application for Reinstatement
Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2021
Decision: Application Denied
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 2001
Summary:
On February 12, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kitakufe(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise by another jurisdiction (United States District Court, Northern District of Illinois.)
In accordance with the Consent Disposition, the Discipline Committee Ordered:
1) that Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration be suspended for six months; the six months having been served from October 1, 1999, to April 1, 2000;
2) the Registrar is directed to impose terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Kitakufe's certificate of registration that he may continue to practise only if and as long as he:
(A) permits the College to monitor his accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan approximately annually;
(B) authorizes the College to obtain information from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan about his billings to the Plan;
(C) pays the expenses of the monitoring in an amount not to exceed $3,500 per year within 60 days of being billed for the expenses for a period of five years from the date of the Order.
3) recorded reprimand;
4) costs, in the amount of $3,750 to be paid to the College by March 30, 2001.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 12, 2001