skip to content

Kitada, Tohru

CPSO#: 94741

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Niigata Kaigaku Igakubu, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 28 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 29 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014