skip to content

Kirupananthan, Shamini

CPSO#: 92652

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shamini Kirupananthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kirupananthan ( CPSO# 92652 )

Business Address:
511 - 2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Phone Number: (416) 900-1002

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management at: 1-800 -775-0093, [email protected] recordsregistry.ca, www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 21 Aug 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:25 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAMINI KIRUPANANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRUPANANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Apr 2010 to 14 May 2010
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2017