skip to content

Kiruluta, Sheila Mae

CPSO#: 30245

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Dec 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Kiruluta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Martin’s Data Management, 400-1473 John Counter Blvd. Kingston, ON, K7K 2P8, 613-542-4510.
Date Received: 28 Nov 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2020