skip to content

Kirsh, Gerald Leonard

CPSO#: 23592

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerald Kirsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients wishing to obtain a copy of their medical records should contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. at: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 12 Sep 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020