skip to content

Kirkpatrick, Sybil Margaret Lyle

CPSO#: 22848

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.M.L. Kirkpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can send a written request to:

Dr S M L Kirkpatrick
C/o Turner Winter
63 Albert Street
Uxbridge, ON 
L9P 1E5
Date Received: 30 May 2024

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2022