skip to content

Kirk, James Norman

CPSO#: 26526

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Norman Kirk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 19, 2019:

Following a College investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Kirk' s standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Kirk underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Kirk' s standard of practice in family medicine. In the face of the reassessment report, Dr. Kirk has agreed:

to practice under supervision until December 31, 2019;

to resign from the College and never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, as of December 31, 2019.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: March 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Norman Kirk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 7, 2016:

Dr. Kirk was the subject of a College Reassessment into his standard of practice. As a result of the Reassessment:
• Dr. Kirk will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;
• Dr. Kirk will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping course; and
• Dr. Kirk’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.