skip to content

Kirk, Gary Marc

CPSO#: 95196

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor-Essex County Health 1005 Ouellette Ave Windsor ON N9A 4J8
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Oct 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gary Marc Kirk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2018:

Dr. Kirk has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.