skip to content

Kirchhof, Mark Gajda

CPSO#: 94330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic
Parkdale Clinic
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4M9
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mark Kirchhof Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirchhof ( CPSO# 94330 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK GAJDA KIRCHHOF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRCHHOF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 23 Aug 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases

Western University, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014