skip to content

Kirby, Thomas James

CPSO#: 31160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Feb 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009