skip to content

Kirby, Emily Kathryn

CPSO#: 86412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 College Dr
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: 705-474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dominic Krzeczunowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kirby ( CPSO# 86412 )
Dr. D. Krzeczunowicz ( CPSO# 86762 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY KATHRYN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009