skip to content

Kirby, Christopher Erle

CPSO#: 91480

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: 613 258-6133 Ext. 768 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St. Laurent Blvd.
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Almonte General Hospital
46 Spring st.
Almonte ON  K0A1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 256-5671
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 256-2514 Ext. 2270
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Arnprior District Memorial Hospital
350 John St N
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doobay Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doobay ( CPSO# 84875 )
Dr. C. Kirby ( CPSO# 91480 )

Business Address:
P.O. Box 2007
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2514

Business Address:
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-2335

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ERLE KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2012