skip to content

Kiraly, Leslie Tamas

CPSO#: 27366

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood General and Marine
Hospital
Community Mental Health Centre
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-6600
Fax: (705) 444-5131
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. T. Kiraly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kiraly ( CPSO# 27366 )

Business Address:
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 778-1496


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLIE TAMAS KIRALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRALY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1975