skip to content

Kinsella, Patrick Laurence

CPSO#: 25919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Sep 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Apr 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1999