skip to content

Kingstone, Eddie

CPSO#: 22603

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 29 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 29-Mar-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2016
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 29 Mar 2020

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 2006
Summary:

On August 2, 2012, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Kingstone, ordered and 
 directed that 2(ii) of the June 5, 2006 Order shall be varied, to read as follows:  

       2(ii) That Dr. Kingstone shall keep a copy of all prescriptions for controlled drugs and 
      substances including benzodiazepines in each patient chart. In addition, Dr. Kingstone 
      shall keep a log of all prescriptions for controlled drugs and substances, including 
      benzodiazepines.  

The Committee further ordered and directed that 2(iii) of the 2006 Order shall be varied, to read 
as follows:  

       2(iii) That Dr. Kingstone shall be required to practice under the supervision of a clinical 
      supervisor acceptable to the College, who has signed the undertaking attached as 
      Appendix 2 to the June 5, 2006 Order. The supervision shall include that Dr. Kingstone is 
      required to meet with the supervisor once monthly at which time the supervisor will 
      review a representative sample of Dr. Kingstone’s patient charts (to be chosen by the 
      supervisor), and discuss them with Dr. Kingstone. Dr. Kingstone is required to follow 
      any recommendations of the clinical supervisor. The supervisor shall submit reports to 
       the College as outlined in the Undertaking.  

 Dr. Kingstone will still be prohibited from prescribing narcotics. He will meet with a clinical 
 supervisor monthly. Copies of all prescriptions for controlled substances, including 
 benzodiazepines, will be kept in patient charts and a log of all such prescriptions will be kept. 

 On February 18, 2016, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Kingstone, made an 
 Order to vary the June 5, 2006 Order of the Discipline Committee (as varied by the August 2, 
 2012 Order of the Discipline Committee). 

 Specifically, the Discipline Committee ordered that the 2006 Order, as varied by the 2012 Order, 
 shall be further varied effective February 10, 2016: (1) to eliminate the supervision requirement 
 contained in paragraph 2(iii) thereof; and (2) to eliminate the requirement for a reassessment 
 pursuant to paragraph 2(iv) of the said Order, and to eliminate the requirement to pay the 
 expenses of such supervision and reassessment pursuant to paragraph 2(v) of the said Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 24, 2006