skip to content

Kingston, William Spencer

CPSO#: 96204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A 455 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 6100 Ext. 1961 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Kingston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kingston ( CPSO# 96204 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3N5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM SPENCER KINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017