skip to content

Kingston, June

CPSO#: 32046

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David C. Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen ( CPSO# 25779 )
Dr. J. Kingston ( CPSO# 32046 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700


Corporation Name: Dr. June Kingston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen ( CPSO# 25779 )
Dr. J. Kingston ( CPSO# 32046 )

Business Address:
5th Floor - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUNE KINGSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980