skip to content

King, David Edmund Lascelles

CPSO#: 21553

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 19 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.