skip to content

King, Charles Benjamin

CPSO#: 97007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Rochester, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Charles B. King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. King ( CPSO# 97007 )

Business Address:
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active
 Dr.  Charles  Benjamin King may practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.