skip to content

King, Carol Philberta

CPSO#: 95252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A5W9
Phone: 5196858355
Fax: 5196858573 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carol King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. King ( CPSO# 95252 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
P.O. Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8355

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROL PHILBERTA KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016