skip to content

Kim, Steve Young

CPSO#: 86500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Parsons Road
Unit 33
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone: (705) 435-7070
Fax: (705) 435-9339 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-3377
Fax: (705) 434-5219
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 86500 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Etobicoke Walk-in Clinic & Family Physicians
Suite 106B
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 742-9449

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
400 Fletcher Crescent
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377

Business Address:
Unit 33
180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 435-7070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVE YOUNG KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012