skip to content

Kim, Julie Jisun

CPSO#: 100528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Emergency Dept
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital, Emergency Dept
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St. Joseph's Hospital
Urgent Care Centre
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: 519-646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIE JISUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018