skip to content

Kim, Dennis S

CPSO#: 94207

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2698 Jane Street 2nd Floor
North York ON  M3L 1S5
Phone: 416-743-2041
Fax: (416) 743-2045 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D.S. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENNIS S KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
EL - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2011 to 23 Feb 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2015