skip to content

Kim, Alexandra Victorovna

CPSO#: 85619

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Dec 2008
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012