skip to content

Kilmartin, Patrick Edward

CPSO#: 26304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 269 Blvd St Jean
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 1J3
Phone: (514) 694-0886
Fax: (514) 694-5336

Additional Practice Location(s)

14 Victoria Street West
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 525-4599
Fax: (613) 525-4368
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick Kilmartin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kilmartin ( CPSO# 26304 )

Business Address:
14 Victoria Street West
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-4599


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Feb 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 04 Feb 2020 Active
             As from February 4, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patrick Edward
            Kilmartin in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kilmartin
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. PATRICK EDWARD KILMARTIN
                                          ("Dr. Kilmartin")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, certificate of registration number 26304, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that the College was advised by the College
                  des medecins du Quebec that I had signed an undertaking confirming that I
                  would retire from emergency medicine in hospital settings by February 24,
                  2019.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, undertake that I will not engage in the practice
                        of acute emergency medicine.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kilmartin, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College was advised by the College des medecins du Quebec
                              that Dr. Kilmartin had signed an undertaking confirming that
                              he would retire from emergency medicine in hospital settings
                              by February 24, 2019. Dr. Kilmartin agreed to sign an
                              undertaking confirming his intent not to practice acute
                              emergency medicine in Ontario.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Kilmartin, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patrick Edward Kilmartin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:

The College was advised by the Collège des médecins du Québec that Dr. Kilmartin had signed an undertaking confirming that he would retire from emergency medicine in hospital settings by February 24, 2019. Dr. Kilmartin agreed to sign an undertaking confirming his intent not to practice acute emergency medicine in Ontario.