skip to content

Kify, Omar H

CPSO#: 85272

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bank Respiratory
1385 Bank street Suite 515
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 523-4444
Fax: (613) 523-6444 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place Hospital
211 LAKE STREET AVE E
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-253-3821
Fax: 613-253-3802
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-732-2811 Ext. 6645
Fax: 613-732-6350
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Kify Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kify ( CPSO# 85272 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Business Address:
515 - 1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 255-3444

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMAR H KIFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010