skip to content

Kielly, Maria

CPSO#: 91620

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H8L1
Phone: 6137377600 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa General
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V1P6
Canada
Phone: 6134324851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

1145 Hunt Club Rd
Suite 560
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: 6137382378
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA KIELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014